+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 256.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 464.) To printer.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor