+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 296.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 692 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate.
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 692.) To printer.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 401.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. To committee.
On December 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On December 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 4
April 21, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor