+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 431.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment No. 846 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Senate. In Senate.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 846.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 2, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To printer.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 520.) To printer.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. To committee.
On November 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On November 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Commerce and Labor
Type:
Primary Sponsor