+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 214.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 6, Absent: 1.) To Senate.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 222.) To printer.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor