+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- (No further action taken.)
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor