+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. Made Special Order of Business for Monday, June 5, 2017, at 11:20 p.m. Bill read. No further consideration.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment Nos. 934 and 971 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. To Senate. In Senate.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 971.) Dispensed with reprinting. To printer. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 14, Excused: 1.) To printer.
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 934.) To printer.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 380.) To printer.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor