+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 218.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Assembly Amendment No. 785 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 785.) To printer.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor