+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter 539.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate.
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 707.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To printer.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 266.) Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. Action of referral rescinded. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor