+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
On April 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Vote
April 8, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor