+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 503.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- To enrollment.
- Assembly Amendment No. 987 concurred in.
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 6, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
On May 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 987.) To printer.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 892.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.
- From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 6
May 21, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor