+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 473.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means: Do pass. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 9, Excused: 2.) To Senate. In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From Concurrent Committee on Education: Do pass.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Education and Ways and Means. To committees.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 737.) To printer. From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice of exemption. Notice to withdraw from committee on next legislative day.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.