+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 262.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Assembly Amendment No. 735 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 735.) To printer.
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 561.) To printer.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. To committee.
On November 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On November 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor