+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- (No further action taken.)
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.