+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (3)
On April 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 41
April 14, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor