+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 593.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate. In Senate. To enrollment.
On June 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On June 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1006.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To printer. From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor