+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Chapter 418.
On June 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 588 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 26, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 25, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 588.) To printer.
On May 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 26, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 276.) To printer.
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor