+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 54.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On December 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On December 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Recommended to be referred to the Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 39
February 26, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor