+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 13, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor