+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 30.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On April 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 2, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 16.) To printer.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. To committee.
On December 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On December 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Government Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor