+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 214.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Assembly Amendment No. 794 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 5, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 794.) To printer.
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 323.) To printer.
On April 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senator Chris Brooks
Type:
Primary Sponsor