+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On May 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File.
- Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
On May 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 879.) To printer.
- Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
- Read third time.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On May 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 744.) To printer.
- Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
On May 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Waiver granted effective: April 8, 2015
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 20
May 19, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 6
April 21, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor