+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (4)
On April 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 16, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor