+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 331.
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Assembly Amendment No. 784 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 2, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 784.) To printer.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 592.) To printer.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor