+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 224.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.