+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Waiver granted effective: June 1, 2015.
On May 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
- Taken from General File.
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 557.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 17, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor