+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
- Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 991.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- EXEMPT, Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6.4(a).
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 27, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 19
May 6, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
April 7, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor