+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 323.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly.
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 53.) Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
On April 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Senator Chris Brooks
Type:
Primary Sponsor