+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 376.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 758 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 758.) To printer.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 459.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
April 16, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor