+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 305.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Assembly Amendment No. 516 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 12, Absent: 1.) To Senate.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 516.) To printer.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 107.) To printer.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senator Roberta Lange
Type:
Primary Sponsor