+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 38
April 15, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor