+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. Made Special Order of Business for June 5, 2023, at 10:59 P.M.. No further consideration.
On May 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 715 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 23, Nays: 19.) To Senate.
On May 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 715.) To printer.
On April 20, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.
On April 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 84.) To printer.
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor