+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- (No further action taken.)
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 629.) Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 469.) To printer.
On April 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor