+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
On April 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 62.) To printer.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor