+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 530.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 724 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 17, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 724.) To printer.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 139.) To printer.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 17
April 2, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsor
Commerce
Type:
Primary Sponsor