+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Chapter 530.
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Assembly Amendment No. 970 concurred in. To enrollment.
On June 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 970.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To printer. From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Senate.
On June 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
On June 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 882.) To printer.
On April 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Notice of exemption.
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor