+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 440.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 898 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 898.) To printer.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 521.) To printer.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.