+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 577.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On June 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 7, Excused: 4.) To Senate.
On June 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 961.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To printer. From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 497.) Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor