+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 45.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On May 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 158.) To printer.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.