+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 118.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To Senate.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 3
March 19, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 19