+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
On April 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 128.) To printer.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.