+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- (No further action taken.)
On April 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 233.) Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To printer.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor