+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 152.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 49.) To printer.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. To committee.
On November 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On November 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor