+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 547.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1129.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To printer. From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Assembly Amendment No. 1129 concurred in. To enrollment.
On June 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1049.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To printer.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 61.) Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.