+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 58.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 128.) To printer.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (6)
May 17, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
May 6, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
April 21, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
April 21, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 2
April 21, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 18
April 9, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor