+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 327.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.) To Senate. In Senate. Assembly Amendment No. 828 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 828.) To printer. From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass, as amended.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 220.) Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.