+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- (No further action taken.)
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 522.) Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.