+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 398.
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 702 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) To Assembly.
- Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 379.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 17, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 39
April 22, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 7
April 15, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor