+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Chapter 404.
On June 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On June 5, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On June 4, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On June 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
On June 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 880.) To printer.
On April 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Notice of exemption.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor