+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 265.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 701 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 13, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 701.) To printer.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 136.) To printer.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor