+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 328.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 17.) To Senate.
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amendment No. 854 not adopted.
- Read second time.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 5, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 136.) To printer.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 17
March 23, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor